EP0306998 - Picking controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tsudakoma Corporation 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa-ken 921 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states Tsudakoma Corporation 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa-ken 921 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takegawa, Yujiro 1-378, Aza-tsurugaoka 4-chome Uchinada-machi Kahoku-gun Ishikawa-ken 920-22 / JP | [1989/11] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88114859.7 | 12.09.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | JP19870226299 | 11.09.1987 Original published format: JP 22629987 | [1989/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0306998 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0306998 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | D03D47/30 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
D03D47/304 (EP,US);
D03D47/34 (KR);
D03D47/30 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/11] | Title | German: | Schusskontrollvorrichtung | [1989/11] | English: | Picking controller | [1989/11] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de l'insertion | [1989/11] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 26.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0263445 (TSUDAKOMA IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0234064 (TSUDAKOMA IND CO LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0279222 (OMV OFF MECC VILMINORE [IT]); | [A]US4673004 (ROSSEEL RIK [BE], et al) |