EP0321655 - Cover for a binder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICHAEL HÖRAUF MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH + CO. KG Mozartstrasse 39-41 D-73072 Donzdorf / DE | [1989/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burger, Rudolf Pottensteiner Strasse 235 A-2763 Penitz, NÖ / AT | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Wilhelm, Hans-Herbert Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Wilhelm, Hans-Herbert, Dr.-Ing. Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte Hospitalstrasse 8 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88115006.4 | 14.09.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | DE19873743724 | 23.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3743724 | [1989/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0321655 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0321655 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B42D3/00 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
B42D3/00 (EP);
B42F13/0013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/26] | Title | German: | Briefordnerdeckel | [1989/26] | English: | Cover for a binder | [1989/26] | French: | Couverture de classeur | [1989/26] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 28.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/31] | 22.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1123779 ; | [A]FR2532343 |