EP0308809 - Machinable stock and machined shaped article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1994 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON ZEON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states NIPPON ZEON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamato, Motoyuki Ooiso Koma Haitsu 2-232, 2-21, Koma, Ooiso-cho Naka-gun, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Ueno, Susumu 34-22-312, Akazutsumi 3-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Chono, Koji 1410-13, Nakashima, Kurashiki-shi Okayama / JP | 04 /
Ishimaru, Yoshiharu 3-10, Kita-karasuyama 3-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1989/13] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 88115090.8 | 15.09.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | JP19870232542 | 18.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23254287 | JP19870232543 | 18.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23254387 | JP19870188161 | 29.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18816187 | [1989/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0308809 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0308809 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/08 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
C08G61/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/13] | Title | German: | Zu verarbeitendes Material und Formteile | [1989/13] | English: | Machinable stock and machined shaped article | [1989/13] | French: | Masse de mise en oeuvre et article façonné | [1989/13] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 12.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 23.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/11] | 20.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0142861 ; | [AD]EP0048439 |