EP0311813 - Pressure-sensitive electric resistor, and manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEDA Logarithmic Electrical Devices for Automation S.r.l. Corso Re Umberto, 1 I-10121 Torino / IT | [1989/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lodini, Paolo Via Giacosa, 10 I-10100 Torino / IT | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1989/16] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 88115206.0 | 16.09.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | IT19870067862 | 13.10.1987 Original published format: IT 6786287 | [1989/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0311813 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0311813 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0311813 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01C10/10 | [1989/16] | CPC: |
H01C10/106 (EP,US);
B29C70/58 (EP,US);
B29C70/882 (EP,US);
B29K2705/00 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/16] | Title | German: | Druckempfindlicher elektrischer Widerstand und Herstellungsverfahren | [1989/16] | English: | Pressure-sensitive electric resistor, and manufacturing process | [1989/16] | French: | Résistance électrique variable par pression et procédé de fabrication | [1989/16] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 28.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 09.12.1992 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2752540 ; | [A]EP0210002 (UNIROYAL LTD [GB]) |