EP0308858 - Method of correcting color image data for obtaining proof image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakatsuka, Kimihiro Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co, Ltd. 1-1 Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Hatayama, Fumihiro Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co, Ltd. 1-1 Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto / JP | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88115362.1 | 20.09.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | JP19870238058 | 22.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23805887 | [1989/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0308858 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0308858 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0308858 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
H04N1/6011 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/13] | Title | German: | Farbilddatenkorrekturverfahren zur Erzielung von Probendruckbildern | [1989/13] | English: | Method of correcting color image data for obtaining proof image | [1989/13] | French: | Procédé pour la correction de données d'images en couleurs pour l'obtention d'images d'épreuve | [1989/13] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1988 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.07.1995 | [2006/32] |
Former [1996/19] | FR | 01.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4075662 (GALL WINRICH); | [A]FR2528207 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]); | [X]EP0147813 (HELL RUDOLF DR ING GMBH [DE]); | [AP]US4710785 (MILLS BORDEN H [US]) |