EP0308908 - Method of making a second article, which is highly precise positionable to a first article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1993 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Büchler B-SET AG Wiler Strasse 98 CH-9230 Flawil / CH | [1989/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Büchler, René Weidweg 2 CH-9345 Oberbüren / CH | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88115510.5 | 21.09.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | DE19873732206 | 24.09.1987 Original published format: DE 3732206 | DE19883814102 | 26.04.1988 Original published format: DE 3814102 | [1989/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0308908 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0308908 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23P13/00, B23P21/00 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
B23P15/00 (EP,US);
B21K1/76 (EP,US);
B23Q1/03 (EP,US);
B23Q16/00 (EP,US);
B23Q16/08 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49648 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49705 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4984 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49973 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49984 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines bezüglich eines zweiten Gegenstandes hochgenau festlegbaren ersten Gegenstandes | [1989/13] | English: | Method of making a second article, which is highly precise positionable to a first article | [1989/13] | French: | Méthode de manufacture d'un second article positionné très précisément par rapport à un premier article | [1989/13] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/13: Teilanmeldung 91105233.0 eingereicht am 21/09/88 | EPB 1992/13: Divisional application 91105233.0 filed on 21/09/88 | EPB 1992/13: Demande divisionnaire 91105233.0 déposée le 21/09/88 | Examination procedure | 27.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 27.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP91105233.0 / EP0446959 | EP91105234.8 / EP0446960 | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3114485 [ ] (CARBOX AB [SE]); | DE2922639 [ ] (UNIV ROSTOV); | DE3618435 [ ] (INTERSPARK S A [CH]); | US4360956 [ ] (HILLER WALTHER); | EP0030042 [ ] (SCHMIDT GMBH KARL [DE]); | US4590783 [ ] (TANAKA HIROSHI [JP], et al) |