EP0309937 - Square baler having plunger cleanout means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.1991 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HESSTON BRAUD (Société Anonyme) F-85220 Coex / FR | [1989/48] |
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states HESSTON S.A. Division Coex F-85220 - Coex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrag, Thomas Gene RR1 Box 92-S Hesston-Kansas 67062 / US | 02 /
Pecenka, Craig 410 Harvest Road Hesston-Kansas 67062 / US | [1989/14] | Representative(s) | Saconney, Piero, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | Saconney, Piero, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 88115665.7 | 23.09.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | US19870103053 | 30.09.1987 Original published format: US 103053 | [1989/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0309937 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/08 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
A01F15/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/14] | Title | German: | Ballenpresse mit Vorrichtung zum Sauberhalten der Kolbenschlitze | [1989/14] | English: | Square baler having plunger cleanout means | [1989/14] | French: | Presse à balles comportant un dispositif de nettoyage des fentes du piston | [1989/14] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 23.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 01.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/03] | 19.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2727458 (HAUSWIRTH VERNON O, et al); | [Y]US4604858 (ESAU EDWARD W [US], et al) |