EP0310912 - Device for ramification of gas currents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1992 [1992/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L. Givaudan & Cie Société Anonyme CH-1214 Vernier-Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states L. GIVAUDAN & CIE Société Anonyme CH-1214 Vernier-Genève / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Etzweiler, Franz Burstwiesenstrasse 41 CH-8606 Greifensee / CH | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Urech, Peter, et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | Urech, Peter, Dr., et al Grenzacherstrasse 124 Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 88115859.6 | 27.09.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | CH19870003948 | 08.10.1987 Original published format: CH 394887 | [1989/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0310912 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0310912 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/46 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
G01N30/461 (EP,US);
G01N2030/383 (EP,US);
G01N30/10 (EP,US);
G01N30/468 (EP,US);
G01N30/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verzweigen von Gasströmen | [1989/15] | English: | Device for ramification of gas currents | [1989/15] | French: | Dispositif pour la bifurcation des courants de gaz | [1989/15] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1988 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 20.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB826110 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [AD]DE1811860 (ICI LTD); | [A]US3668834 (DEANS DAVID ROBERT); | [A]DE2520075 (STUDIENGESELLSCHAFT KOHLE MBH); | [AD]DE2840612 (SIEMENS AG) | [A] - JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, Band 112, 1975, Seiten 205-217, Elsevier Scientific Publishing CO., Amsterdam. NL; G. SCHOMBURG et al.: "Aspects of double-column gas chromatography with glass capillaries involving intermediate trapping" | [A] - CHROMATOGRAPHIA, Band 1, 1968, Seiten 18-22, D.R. DEANS: "Eine neue Technik des "heart cuttings" in der Gas-Chromatographie" |