EP0325691 - Process for the solubilization of insoluble protein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.1994 [1994/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consortium für elektrochemische Industrie GmbH Zielstattstrasse 20 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/31] | For all designated states Consortium für elektrochemische Industrie GmbH Zielstattstrasse 20 D-81379 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fanning, Ellen, Prof. Dr. Ferdinand-Maria-Strasse 41 D-8000 München 19 / DE | 02 /
Höss, Adolf, Dipl.-Chem. Bergstrasse 2 D-8164 Hausham / DE | 03 /
Arthur, Avril, Dr. Römerstrasse 25 D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1989/31] | Application number, filing date | 88115908.1 | 27.09.1988 | [1989/31] | Priority number, date | DE19883802045 | 25.01.1988 Original published format: DE 3802045 | [1989/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0325691 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0325691 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325691 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K3/08, C07K3/22 | [1989/31] | CPC: |
C07K1/113 (EP,US);
C07K1/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1989/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Solubilisierung von unlöslichem Protein | [1989/31] | English: | Process for the solubilization of insoluble protein | [1989/31] | French: | Procédé de solubilisation des protéines insolubles | [1989/31] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 27.09.1988 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 29.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - PROTEIN PURIFICATION, Micro to Marco, p 429-442 | [T] - BIOTECHNOLOGY 6 S. 1214-17 | [T] - BIOFUTUR 77, p. 3-9 |