EP0317746 - Articulated toolbar connection for fodder harvester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Saulgau GmbH Postfach 11 54 88340 Bad Saulgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | For all designated states CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH Postfach 1154 D-88340 Saulgau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deni, Franz Bergstrasse 14 D-7968 Saulgau-Bogenweiler / DE | 02 /
Rauch, Hans Im Krummeschle 9 D-7968 Saulgau-Kleintissen / DE | [1989/22] | Application number, filing date | 88116368.7 | 04.10.1988 | [1989/22] | Priority number, date | DE19873739485 | 21.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3739485 | [1989/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0317746 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0317746 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317746 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01B73/04, F16D3/32 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
F16D3/32 (EP);
A01D78/1007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/22] | Title | German: | Gelenkige Rahmenverbindung für Futtererntemaschinen | [1989/22] | English: | Articulated toolbar connection for fodder harvester | [1989/22] | French: | Barre porte-outils articulé pour récolteuse fourragère | [1989/22] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 25.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1158304 (FAHR AG MASCHF); | [AD]DE1266556 (FAHR AG MASCHF); | [A]GB2057239 (LELY NV C VAN DER); | [A]DE3151481 (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]) |