EP0311044 - Sintered body having high corrosion resistance containing ZrB2. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isozaki, Kei Denki Kagaku Kogyo K.K. Omuta Kojo 1 shinkaimachi Omuta-shi Fukuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsunaga, Hirotsugu Denki Kagaku Kogyo K.K. Omuta Kojo 1 shinkaimachi Omuta-shi Fukuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Imamura, Yasuo Denki Kagaku Kogyo K.K. Omuta Kojo 1 shinkaimachi Omuta-shi Fukuoka-ken / JP | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/11] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Mozartstrasse 23 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/15] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Neuer Wall 41 D-20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88116475.0 | 05.10.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | JP19870250728 | 06.10.1987 Original published format: JP 25072887 | JP19870250730 | 06.10.1987 Original published format: JP 25073087 | [1989/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0311044 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0311044 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/58, C04B35/56 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
C04B35/645 (EP,US);
C04B35/5607 (EP,US);
C04B35/58071 (EP,US);
C04B35/58078 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/15] | Title | German: | Sinterkörper mit hoher Korrosionsbeständigkeit und einem Gehalt an ZrB2 | [1989/15] | English: | Sintered body having high corrosion resistance containing ZrB2. | [1989/15] | French: | Corps fritté ayant une haute résistance à la corrosion et contenant du ZrB2 | [1989/15] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 29.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP58190874 [ ]; | JP59107974 [ ]; | EP0131884 [ ] (KEMPTEN ELEKTROSCHMELZ GMBH [DE]); | US4678759 [ ] (KIDA OTOJIRO [JP], et al) | [ ] - Derwent Accession No. 83-841 984, Questel Telesystemes (WPI/L) Derwent Publications Ltd., London *Abstract* & JP-A-58-190 874 (Nippon Oils & Fats K.K.), & JP58190874 A 00000000 | [ ] - Derwent Accession No. 84-191 723, (KUBOTA K.K. et al.), Questel Telesystemes (WPI/L) Derwent Publications Ltd., London *Abstract* & JP-A-59-107 974, & JP59107974 A 00000000 | Examination | JP59107974 | - DERWENT ACCESSION N:o 84-191 723, Questel Telesystemes (WPI/L), Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & JP-A-59107974, & JP59107974 A 00000000 |