EP0311047 - Dynamic random access memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1994 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | For all designated states FUJITSU VLSI LIMITED 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi Aichi 487 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | ||
For all designated states FUJITSU VLSI LIMITED 1844-2, Kozoji-cho 2-chome Kasugai-shi Aichi 487 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mochizuki, Hirohiko 2393-1, Arima Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 213 / JP | 02 /
Ohira, Tsuyoshi 926-102, Shimosakunobe Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 213 / JP | 03 /
Kodama, Yukinori 7-3-38, Kikuna Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa, 222 / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Meiko 5-26-8-903, Kamata Ota-ku Tokyo, 144 / JP | 05 /
Furuyama, Takaaki 878, Shimonoge Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 213 / JP | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88116484.2 | 05.10.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | JP19870251983 | 06.10.1987 Original published format: JP 25198387 | [1989/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0311047 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0311047 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0311047 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/24 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
G11C11/34 (KR);
G11C11/408 (EP,US);
G11C8/14 (EP,US);
G11C8/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/15] | Title | German: | Dynamischer RAM-Speicher | [1989/15] | English: | Dynamic random access memory | [1989/15] | French: | Mémoire RAM dynamique | [1989/15] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/39] | 07.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4144590 (KITAGAWA NORIHISA, et al); | [A]EP0023329 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]EP0145488 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) |