EP0311096 - Coarse/fine adjustment coaxial handle for feeding microscope stage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Optical Co., Ltd. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO., LTD. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogiwara, Takashi Sawa 6324 Nishimachi-ku Ina-shi Nagano-ken / JP | 02 /
Isono, Kesao Ooaza-Ina 1009-1 Ina-shi Nagano-ken / JP | 03 /
Katagiri, Masahide Nakayama 1079-83 3-42-16, Hachiouji Tokyo / JP | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann Patentanwälte Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1989/15] | Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet Neuer Wall 10 D-20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88116642.5 | 07.10.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | JP19870255614 | 09.10.1987 Original published format: JP 25561487 | JP19870255615 | 09.10.1987 Original published format: JP 25561587 | [1989/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0311096 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0311096 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0311096 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/26 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
G02B21/26 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T74/18752 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1989/15] | Title | German: | Koaxialer Grob-/Feinversteller zur Bedienung eines Mikroskoptisches | [1989/15] | English: | Coarse/fine adjustment coaxial handle for feeding microscope stage | [1989/15] | French: | Poignée approche/précision coaxiale pour l'avance des platines porte-objet | [1989/15] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/16] | 12.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.11.1988 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   14.12.1988 | 07.11.1988 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   14.12.1988 | 07.11.1988 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   14.12.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2648484 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK); | [A]US4083256 (SHIO MEGUMU); | [A]DE3345326 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]); | [A]DE2344210 ; | [A]US3683704 (KUROHA NOBORU) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 77 (E-31)(1255), 22 July 1977 & JP A 52014429 |