EP0332738 - Method for reducing the alcohol content in alcoholic beverages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Carbone AG Talstrasse 112 Postfach 56 02 09 60407 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states Deutsche Carbone AG Talstrasse 112 Postfach 56 02 09 D-60407 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1989/38] | For all designated states GFT Gesellschaft für Trenntechnik mbH Gerberstrasse 48 D-66424 Homburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brüschke, Hartmut, Ernst, Arthur, Dr. Kurpfalzstrasse 64 6907 Nussloch / DE | 02 /
Schneider, Walter Goethestrasse 70 6901 Dossenheim / DE | 03 /
Tusel, Günter F. Lieselottenstrasse 12 6650 Homburg/Saar / DE | [1989/38] | Representative(s) | Geissler, Bernhard, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | Geissler, Bernhard, Dr. jur., Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88116674.8 | 07.10.1988 | [1989/38] | Priority number, date | DE19883804236 | 11.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3804236 | [1989/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0332738 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0332738 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12G3/08, B01D17/00 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
B01D61/362 (EP,US);
C12H3/04 (EP,US);
Y10S159/27 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/38] | C12G3/08, B01D13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduktion des Alkoholgehaltes von alkoholischen Getränken | [1989/38] | English: | Method for reducing the alcohol content in alcoholic beverages | [1989/38] | French: | Procédé pour diminuer la teneur en alcool de boissons alcoolisées | [1989/38] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 21.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.07.1994 | GR | 06.07.1994 | SE | 06.10.1994 | LU | 31.10.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 06.07.1994 | |
SE | 06.10.1994 | ||
LU | 31.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | SE | 06.10.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8605706 (MEMTEC LTD [AU]); | [A]EP0240803 (GEESTHACHT GKSS FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [A]EP0254758 (SETEC B V [NL]) |