EP0313915 - Surface treatment of polyolefin objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.1993 [1993/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DYNEEMA V.O.F. Dr. Nolenslaan 119 NL-6136 GM Sittard / NL | [1989/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cree, Stephen Henry 2 Blairmains Cottage Blairlogie Stirling / GB | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R., et al DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Geleen Postbus 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland, et al OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 88116881.9 | 12.10.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | NL19870002447 | 14.10.1987 Original published format: NL 8702447 | [1989/18] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0313915 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/02, C08J5/12, C08J5/06 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
C08J5/06 (EP,US);
C08J5/122 (EP,US);
C08J7/02 (EP,US);
C08J2323/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/18] | Title | German: | Oberflächenbehandlung von Polyolefingegenständen | [1989/18] | English: | Surface treatment of polyolefin objects | [1989/18] | French: | Traitement de surface d'articles de polyoléfines | [1989/18] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 07.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/04] | 03.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0144997 (STAMICARBON [NL]); | [Y]GB929180 (DUNLOP RUBBER CO); | [Y]GB1026683 (DUNLOP RUBBER CO); | [A]US3201302 (WILLIAMS JR ROBERT F, et al); | [A]GB755738 (DU PONT [US]); | [AD]US4668717 (LEMSTRA PIETER J [NL], et al) |