EP0312013 - Moulded objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.1993 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMS-Inventa AG 8001 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | For all designated states EMS-INVENTA AG CH-8001 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schultze, Hans-Joachim, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Tittwiesenstrasse 11 CH-7000 Chur / CH | 02 /
Liedloff, Hanns-Joerg, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Untere Bahnhoffstrasse 59 CH-7013 Domat/Ems / CH | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/16] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 6 Postfach 26 02 47 D-80059 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88116938.7 | 12.10.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | DE19873734645 | 13.10.1987 Original published format: DE 3734645 | [1989/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0312013 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0312013 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/24 | [1989/16] | CPC: |
C08L77/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L77/00, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/18 (EP,US);
C08L77/00, C08L77/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/16] | Title | German: | Formkörper | [1989/16] | English: | Moulded objects | [1989/16] | French: | Objets moulés | [1989/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 30.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/24] | 18.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0071968 (ALLIED CORP [US]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 45TH ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE OF THE SOCIETY OF PLASTICS ENGINEERS, Los Angeles, 4. - 7. Mai 1987, pages 1404-1409; T.-S. CHUNG: "Thermotropic liquid-crystal polyester/nylon 12 blends" | [AD] - KUNSTSTOFFE, Band 72, Juli 1982, Seiten 402-407, München, DE; H. KÄUFER et al.: "Spritzgiesspressrecken als Verfahrensmethode zur Herstellung thermoplastischer Formteile mit neuem Eigenschaftsniveau" |