EP0312070 - Cyclobutarene ketoaniline monomeric and polymeric compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | Change - applicant | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [1998/02] |
Former [1989/16] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruza, Kenneth J. 302 Coolidge Drive Midland Michigan 48640 / US | 02 /
Kirchhoff, Robert A. 3800 Fuller Drive Midland Michigan 48640 / US | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Huber, Bernhard, et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117064.1 | 13.10.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | US19870109136 | 16.10.1987 Original published format: US 109136 | [1989/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0312070 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0312070 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C97/10, C08F299/02 | [1989/16] | CPC: |
C08G61/06 (EP,US);
C07C225/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/16] | Title | German: | Cyclobutarenketoanilin-Monomere und polymere Zusammensetzungen | [1989/16] | English: | Cyclobutarene ketoaniline monomeric and polymeric compositions | [1989/16] | French: | Cyclobutarène cétoaniline compositions monomères et polymères | [1989/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 18.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/36] | 06.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4540763 (KIRCHHOFF ROBERT A [US]); | [AD]US4570011 (SO YING-HUNG [US]); | [A]US4622375 (WONG PUI K [US]); | [X]WO8705303 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) |