EP0312073 - Connector with a valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Braun Melsungen AG Postfach 120 34209 Melsungen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | For all designated states B. Braun Melsungen AG Postfach 120 D-34209 Melsungen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haindl, Hans-Günter Schoene Aussicht 4 D-3508 Melsungen / DE | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117083.1 | 14.10.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | DE19873734894 | 15.10.1987 Original published format: DE 3734894 | [1989/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0312073 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0312073 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0312073 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/00 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
A61M39/288 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/27] | A61M37/00 | ||
Former IPC [1989/16] | A61M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/16] | Title | German: | Ansatzstück mit Ventil | [1989/16] | English: | Connector with a valve | [1989/16] | French: | Embout muni d'une valve | [1989/16] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 21.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE372374 ; | [A]US2211759 (PITNER LLOYD E); | [A]EP0172629 (CRAIG MED PROD LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0189651 (CRAIG MED PROD LTD [GB]) |