EP0312099 - Process for producing a polyacetylene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1989/16] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Ohazakadoma Kadoma, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Kazufumi 30-5, Higashinakaburi-1-chome Hirakata-shi / JP | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/16] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117138.3 | 14.10.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | JP19870260291 | 15.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26029187 | JP19870260293 | 15.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26029387 | [1989/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0312099 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0312099 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0312099 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0312099 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08F38/00 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
C08F38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/16] | C08F38/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyacetylen | [1989/16] | English: | Process for producing a polyacetylene | [1989/16] | French: | Procédé de préparation de polyacétylène | [1989/16] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 10.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3923622 (BAUGHMAN RAY H, et al) | [A] - Journal of Polymer Science: Polymer Letters Edition, Vol. 16, 1978, John Wiley & Sons Inc., New York, D. DAY et al.: "Polymerization of diacetylene carbonic acid monolayers at the gas-water interface", pages 205-210 |