EP0364609 - Double cylinder lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.1992 [1992/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IKON AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Präzisionstechnik Dornhaldenstrasse 5 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states Zeiss Ikon AG Dornhaldenstrasse 5 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krühn, Jürgen Baseler Strasse 170 D-1000 Berlin 45 / DE | [1990/17] | Application number, filing date | 88117170.6 | 15.10.1988 | [1990/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0364609 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0364609 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E05B9/10 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
E05B9/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, LI, NL [1990/17] | Title | German: | Doppelzylinderschloss | [1990/17] | English: | Double cylinder lock | [1990/17] | French: | Serrure à double cylindre | [1990/17] | File destroyed: | 15.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/11] | 14.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.08.1991 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE3734539 ; | [E]DE8716645U ; | [E]DE3817940 ; | [A]DE2548139 ; | [A]DE3524638 |