EP0313054 - Transceiver for use in earth station in satellite communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1994 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hotta, Toshinori c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117504.6 | 20.10.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | JP19870265645 | 20.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26564587 | [1989/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0313054 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0313054 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0313054 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
H04B7/208 (EP,US);
H04B7/14 (KR);
H04B7/15 (KR);
H04B7/185 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/17] | Title | German: | Bodenstationssender-Empfänger in einem Satellitenkommunikationssystem | [1989/17] | English: | Transceiver for use in earth station in satellite communications system | [1989/17] | French: | Emetteur-récepteur de station terrestre d'un système de communication par satellite | [1989/17] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1988 | Examination requested [1989/17] | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4466130 (SEWERINSON AKE N [CA]); | [A]EP0090705 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [A] - IEEE - INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS '86, Toronto, 22nd-25th June 1986, vol. 2, pages 1088-1092, IEEE, New York, US; R. DE CRISTOFARO et al.: "Secure satellite communications in the ISDN" |