EP0314006 - Button, especially for clothing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffer GmbH Schützenstrasse 23 D-42281 Wuppertal / DE | [1989/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collas, Wolfgang, Ing. Hügelstrasse 18 D-5600 Wuppertal 2 / DE | 02 /
Wolfertz, Günter, Ing. Linderhauser Strasse 19 D-5600 Wuppertal 2 / DE | 03 /
Wolfertz, Roger, Dipl.-Ing. Schützenstrasse 43 D-5600 Wuppertal 2 / DE | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Rieder, Hans-Joachim, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Postfach 11 04 51 42304 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | Rieder, Hans-Joachim, Dr., et al Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Postfach 11 04 51 D-42304 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1989/18] | Grosse, Rainer Postfach 110451 Corneliusstrasse 45 D-5600 Wuppertal 11 / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117546.7 | 21.10.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | DE19870014192U | 24.10.1987 Original published format: DE 8714192 U | [1989/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0314006 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0314006 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A44B1/08 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
A44B1/08 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3611 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3683 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/18] | Title | German: | Knopf, insbesondere für Kleidungsstücke | [1989/18] | English: | Button, especially for clothing | [1989/18] | French: | Bouton, en particulier pour vêtements | [1989/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/52] | 12.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 05.08.1992 | IT | 05.08.1992 | AT | 21.10.1992 | ES | 22.10.1992 | SE | 22.10.1992 | BE | 31.10.1992 | CH | 31.10.1992 | LI | 31.10.1992 | LU | 31.10.1992 | GB | 05.11.1992 | NL | 01.05.1993 | [2004/37] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 05.08.1992 | |
IT | 05.08.1992 | ||
AT | 21.10.1992 | ||
SE | 22.10.1992 | ||
BE | 31.10.1992 | ||
CH | 31.10.1992 | ||
LI | 31.10.1992 | ||
LU | 31.10.1992 | ||
GB | 05.11.1992 | ||
NL | 01.05.1993 | ||
Former [1999/52] | IT | 05.08.1992 | |
AT | 21.10.1992 | ||
SE | 22.10.1992 | ||
BE | 31.10.1992 | ||
CH | 31.10.1992 | ||
LI | 31.10.1992 | ||
LU | 31.10.1992 | ||
GB | 05.11.1992 | ||
NL | 01.05.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 05.08.1992 | |
AT | 21.10.1992 | ||
SE | 22.10.1992 | ||
BE | 31.10.1992 | ||
CH | 31.10.1992 | ||
LI | 31.10.1992 | ||
GB | 05.11.1992 | ||
NL | 01.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/19] | AT | 21.10.1992 | |
SE | 22.10.1992 | ||
BE | 31.10.1992 | ||
CH | 31.10.1992 | ||
LI | 31.10.1992 | ||
GB | 05.11.1992 | ||
NL | 01.05.1993 | ||
Former [1993/48] | SE | 22.10.1992 | |
BE | 31.10.1992 | ||
CH | 31.10.1992 | ||
LI | 31.10.1992 | ||
GB | 05.11.1992 | ||
NL | 01.05.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | SE | 22.10.1992 | |
BE | 31.10.1992 | ||
CH | 31.10.1992 | ||
LI | 31.10.1992 | ||
NL | 01.05.1993 | ||
Former [1993/28] | SE | 22.10.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1780555 (JOHNSON ERIC G); | [X]FR1418248 (GOEPFER ETS); | [A]EP0090131 (PRYM WERKE WILLIAM [DE]); | [AD]DE3405830 (NIPPON NOTION KOGYO [JP]) | Examination | EP0291047 |