EP0314014 - Hybrid electro-pneumatic robot joint actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.1991 [1991/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petrosky, Lyman Jay R.D. Nr. 2 Box 302 Latrobe Pennsylvania 15650 / US | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117582.2 | 21.10.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | US19870113845 | 28.10.1987 Original published format: US 113845 | [1989/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0314014 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B25J17/02, B25J9/14, B25J9/12, H02K7/00, F01C21/00 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
H02K7/00 (EP,KR,US);
B25J9/126 (EP,KR,US);
B25J17/0241 (EP,KR,US);
B25J9/148 (EP,KR,US);
F01C21/008 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/18] | Title | German: | Hybrider elektro-pneumatischer Aktuator für Robotergelenke | [1989/18] | English: | Hybrid electro-pneumatic robot joint actuator | [1989/18] | French: | Actuateur hybride électro pneumatique pour articulation de robot | [1989/18] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 09.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/49] | 28.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/45] | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3971480 (HAMILTON JOSEPH R); | [A]EP0048415 (RMC ROTATIONSMASCH GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE8511473U ; | [A]US4551073 (SCHWAB WALTER [AT]); | [X]DE3539011 (MOLLNAU ERICH LOTHAR) | [X] - U.S. GOVERNMENT REPORT AD-D012052, serial number 750952 (DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY-SEERING) |