EP0314028 - Method for increasing the efficiency of a steam process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEG KANIS GMBH Frankenstrasse 70-80 D-8500 Nürnberg 40 / DE | [1989/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Korpela, Timo, Dr. Pohjantie 4c SF-02100 Espoo / FI | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Lertes, Kurt AEG Aktiengesellschaft, Patent- und Lizenzwesen D-60591 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | Lertes, Kurt, Dr. AEG Aktiengesellschaft, Patent- und Lizenzwesen D-60591 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117638.2 | 22.10.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | FI19870004718 | 27.10.1987 Original published format: FI 874718 | [1989/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0314028 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F01K7/18, F01K23/10 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
F01K3/185 (EP);
F01K7/18 (EP);
F22B3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung des Wirkungsgrades im Dampfprozess | [1989/18] | English: | Method for increasing the efficiency of a steam process | [1989/18] | French: | Procédé pour augmenter le rendement d'un processus de vapeur | [1989/18] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.11.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/27] | 24.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2476240 ; | [X]US4394813 ; | [A]GB1035728 |