EP0315003 - Elaiophylin derivatives, method for their preparation, product containing them and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1992 | Change - withdrawal | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kretzschmar, Gerhard, Dr. Falkenstrasse 71 D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | 02 /
Düwel, Dieter, Dr. Frankfurter Strasse 39 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 03 /
Grabley, Susanne, Dr. Hölderlinstrasse 7 D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | 04 /
Hammann, Peter, Dr. Mörikestrasse 6 D-6233 Kelkheim/Taunus / DE | 05 /
Voelskow, Hartmut, Dr. Akazienstrasse 22 D-6234 Hattersheim am Main / DE | 06 /
Giani, Carlo, Dr. Hedderichstrasse 69 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 70 / DE | 07 /
Seibert, Gerhard, Prof. Dr. Gläserweg 21 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [1989/19] | Application number, filing date | 88117656.4 | 24.10.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | DE19873736960 | 31.10.1987 Original published format: DE 3736960 | [1989/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0315003 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0315003 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/04, C07H15/26, A61K31/70 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
C07H15/26 (EP,US);
A61P33/10 (EP);
C07H17/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/19] | C07H7/04, C07H15/26, A61K31/70 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/19] | Title | German: | Elaiophylinderivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, diese enthaltende Mittel und Verwendung derselben | [1989/19] | English: | Elaiophylin derivatives, method for their preparation, product containing them and its use | [1989/19] | French: | Dérivés de l'élaiophyline, méthode pour leur préparation, le produit les contenant et son utilisation | [1989/19] | File destroyed: | 11.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 05.05.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3248280 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [X]EP0297523 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [X]JPS6136295 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 106, Nr. 9, 2. M{rz 1987, Seite 646, Zusammenfassung Nr. 67626j, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-61 036 295 (TOKYO TANABE CO.LTD) 20-02-1986 | [A] - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, Band 64, Fasc. 2, Nr. 41, 18. M{rz 1981, Seiten 407-424, Schweizerische Chemische Gesellschaft, BaselCH; H. KAISER et al.: "Stoffwechselprodukte von Mikroorganismen; Strukturaufkl{rung von Elaiophylin: Spektroskopische Untersuchungen und Abbau" |