EP0314089 - Apparatus for displacing a row of peg-trays in a textile mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.1993 [1993/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448 / JP | For all designated states Nisshinbo Industries, Inc. 31-33 Ningyocho 2-chome Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448 / JP | ||
For all designated states NISSHINBO INDUSTRIES, INC. 3-10, Nihonbashi Yokoyama-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawasaki, Yoshio 10-9, Azuma-cho Shimada-shi Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Horibe, Tatutake 1433, Zenzaemon Fujieda-shi Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Haruyoshi Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi / JP | 04 /
Morita, Takayuki Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi / JP | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Haecker, Walter, et al Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | Haecker, Walter, et al Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 88117812.3 | 26.10.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | JP19870164763U | 27.10.1987 Original published format: JP 16476387 U | [1989/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0314089 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0314089 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D01H9/18, D01H9/10, B65H67/06, B65G35/06 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
D01H9/187 (EP);
D01H9/18 (KR);
D01H9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, IT, LI [1989/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verschieben von Spulentransportträgern, die aus einer scheibenartigen Grundplatte und einem mittigen Zapfen bestehen, in einer Spinnerei | [1989/18] | English: | Apparatus for displacing a row of peg-trays in a textile mill | [1989/18] | French: | Dispositif pour déplacer dans une filature une rangée d'éléments porteurs en forme de disque et d'une cheville placée au centre de celui-ci | [1989/18] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 05.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3630670 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) |