EP0315148 - Thermal insulation for a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lonza AG Münchensteinerstrasse 38 4052 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states LONZA AG CH-3945 Gampel/Wallis / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumann, Hansjörg, Dipl.-Chem. Bahnhofstrasse Mühlau (Aargau) / CH | 02 /
Schill, Manfred Mühlebergstrasse 66 Affoltern am Albis (Zürich) / CH | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Weinhold, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Weinhold, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118258.8 | 02.11.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | CH19870004306 | 04.11.1987 Original published format: CH 430687 | [1989/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0315148 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0315148 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/38, F16L59/02 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
F16L59/029 (EP,US);
B65D81/3823 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1376 (EP,US);
Y10T428/233 (EP,US);
Y10T428/239 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24992 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249976 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249977 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249981 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249985 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/19] | Title | German: | Isoliersystem für wärmegedämmte Behälter | [1989/19] | English: | Thermal insulation for a container | [1989/19] | French: | Isolation thermique pour récipient | [1989/19] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 16.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0030930 (SEMPERIT AG [AT]); | [A]FR2237116 (DAMOIS FRERES ETS [FR]); | [A]FR2513223 (CELLUTEC SA [FR]); | [A]US3189243 (LUX JOHN H); | [A]US3560293 (PIKER HERBERT M) |