|
13.01.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1998 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1998 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.1998 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.12.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.12.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
32 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1997 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.1997 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.09.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
18 |
|
05.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1997 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.1997 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.1995 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
23.03.1995 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.1995 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.09.1994 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.1994 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1994 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.1994 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.1994 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.1994 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.06.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.06.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.06.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.06.1994 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.10.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.05.1993 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
16 |
|
22.03.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1993 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1993 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.12.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1992 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1992 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1992 |
Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1992 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.07.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.07.1992 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.09.1991 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1991 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.07.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.03.1991 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.1991 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.1990 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
19.11.1990 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
18.10.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.07.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1989 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1989 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.1989 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.1989 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.1989 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.1989 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
30.11.1988 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |