EP0315913 - Antiseborrhoic topical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1993 [1993/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möller, Hinrich, Dr. Haydnstrasse 27 D-4019 Monheim / DE | 02 /
Banduhn, Norbert, Dr. Gerhard-Hauptmann-Strasse 44 D-4006 Erkrath 1 / DE | [1989/20] | Application number, filing date | 88118409.7 | 04.11.1988 | [1989/20] | Priority number, date | DE19873738406 | 12.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3738406 | [1989/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0315913 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0315913 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/48, A61K31/085, A61K31/19, A61K31/235, A61K31/22 | [1989/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/235 (EP,US);
A61K31/085 (EP,US);
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K8/33 (EP,US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/36 (EP,US);
A61K8/368 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61Q19/008 (EP,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/20] | Title | German: | Sebosuppressive topische Zubereitungen | [1989/20] | English: | Antiseborrhoic topical compositions | [1989/20] | French: | Compositions topiques antiséborrhoiques | [1989/20] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 16.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2528826 (SANOFI SA [FR]); | [AD]EP0114051 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) |