EP0317809 - Sheated particle flow controlled by differential pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.1993 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
North, Howard L., Jr. 100 Via Santa Maria Los Gatos California / US | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1989/22] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118412.1 | 04.11.1988 | [1989/22] | Priority number, date | US19870125095 | 25.11.1987 Original published format: US 125095 | [1989/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0317809 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0317809 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/14, G05D16/20 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
G01N15/1404 (EP,US);
G05D16/028 (EP,US);
G05D16/2013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für umhüllten Teilchendurchfluss mit Kontrolle durch Differentialdruck | [1989/22] | English: | Sheated particle flow controlled by differential pressure | [1989/22] | French: | Dispositif d'écoulement gainé de particules contrôlé par une pression différentielle | [1989/22] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 06.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/20] | 21.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61249120 ; | [A]EP0125857 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]EP0046345 (ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [A]EP0121261 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]); | [AD]EP0131287 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 100 (P-561)[2547], 28th March 1987; & JP-A-61 249 120 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND. LTD) 06-11-1986, & JP61249120 A 00000000 |