EP0367847 - Dye setting steam chamber apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robbins, Ronald B. 619 Meadowbrooke Court Duncanville Texas 75137 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states Robbins, Ronald B. 619 Meadowbrooke Court Duncanville Texas 75137 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/20] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118529.2 | 07.11.1988 | [1990/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0367847 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367847 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D06B19/00, D06B23/14 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
D06B19/0029 (EP,US);
D06B23/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL [1990/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Fixieren von Färbungen durch Dampf | [1990/20] | English: | Dye setting steam chamber apparatus and method | [1990/20] | French: | Installation pour le fixage de colorants par la vapeur | [1990/20] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 19.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH543629 (STANG HANS [DE]); | [A]FR2317405 (COHEN TANUGI LITZA [FR]) |