EP0316706 - Polymerizable compounds and mixture polymerizable by radiation containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/21] | Polymerizable compounds and mixtures polymerizable by radiation containing them | ||
[1994/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1994 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gersdorf, Joachim, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Philipp-Holl-Strasse 26 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
Rode, Klaus, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Habelstrasse 5 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1989/21] | Application number, filing date | 88118537.5 | 08.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | DE19873738864 | 16.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3738864 | [1989/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0316706 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0316706 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0316706 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/42, C07D295/08, G03F7/004 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
G03F7/027 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/36 (EP,KR,US);
C09D4/00 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F220/36 (US,KR,EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/21] | C07C93/04, C07D295/08, G03F7/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/21] | Title | German: | Polymerisierbare Verbindungen und dieses enthaltendes durch Strahlung polymerisierbares Gemisch | [1989/21] | English: | Polymerizable compounds and mixture polymerizable by radiation containing them | [1994/08] | French: | Composés polymérisables et mélange polymérisable par radiation les contenant | [1989/21] |
Former [1989/21] | Polymerizable compounds and mixtures polymerizable by radiation containing them | Examination procedure | 17.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 03.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62000950 ; | [AD]US3759807 (OSBORN C, et al); | [AD]DE3331157 (BASF AG [DE]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 107, Teil 6, 10. August 1987, Seite 660, Zusammenfassung Nr. 49611s, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-62 000 950 (NIPPON PAINT CO. LTD) 06-01-1987, & JP62000950 A 00000000 |