EP0316720 - Clamp to adjust the flow of a tube, particularly for disposable medical devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forberg, Hans-Jürgen Sebenter Weg 4 D-23738 Damlos / DE | [1989/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Wilcken, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann Bei der Lohmühle 23 23554 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Wilcken, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann Musterbahn 1 D-23552 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118595.3 | 09.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | DE19873738965 | 17.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3738965 | [1989/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0316720 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0316720 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0316720 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14, F16K7/06 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
A61M39/286 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/21] | A61M5/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/03] |
Former [1989/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Klemme zum Einstellen des Durchflussquerschnittes eines Schlauches, insbesondere für medizinische Einmalgeräte | [1989/21] | English: | Clamp to adjust the flow of a tube, particularly for disposable medical devices | [1989/21] | French: | Clamp pour régler le débit d'un tube, en particulier pour appareils médicaux à usage unique | [1989/21] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 26.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2242539 (TRANSCODAN); | [AD]DE2718985 (SIEBER PAUL); | [A]US4340201 (BECKER JR KARL E); | [A]US4697785 (TUSETH ROBERT D [US]) |