EP0323555 - Aluminum resistant refractory composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Premier Refractories and Chemicals Inc. 901 East 8th Avenue King of Prussia Pennsylvania 19406 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | For all designated states Premier Refractories and Chemicals Inc. 901 East 8th Avenue King of Prussia Pennsylvania 19406 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Porterfield, Andrew Dean 386 Palos Verdes Boulevard Redondo Beach California 90277 / US | [1989/28] | Representative(s) | Barnieske, Hans Wolfgang c/o H.W. Barnieske Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 25 Turingegatan 26 S-151 21 Södertälje 1 / SE | [1990/10] |
Former [1989/28] | Gross, Gernot K. Rechtsanwalt Kleiberweg 5 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 88118617.5 | 09.11.1988 | [1989/28] | Priority number, date | US19870129213 | 07.12.1987 Original published format: US 129213 | [1989/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0323555 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/66, C04B35/00 | [1989/28] | CPC: |
C04B35/6303 (EP,US);
C04B35/66 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00879 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9676 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, SE [1989/28] | Title | German: | Gegen Aluminium beständige feuerfeste Zusammensetzung | [1989/28] | English: | Aluminum resistant refractory composition | [1989/28] | French: | Composition réfractaire résistante à l'aluminium | [1989/28] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 15.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/23] | 14.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.05.1991 | 30.11.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0127051 (COMBUSTION ENG [US]); | [XD]US4522926 (FELICE FRANK T [US]) |