EP0315993 - Soluble and/or fusible block polyamide-polyamides, polyamide-polyamideimides and polyamides-polyimides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.1993 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.1993 [1993/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chemie Linz Gesellschaft m.b.H. St.Peter-Strasse 25 A-4021 Linz / AT | [1989/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greber, Gerd Anzengruberstrasse 11 A-2540 Bad Vöslau / AT | 02 /
Gruber, Heinrich Cottagegasse 82 A-1190 Wien / AT | 03 /
Sychra, Marcel Friedhofstrasse 44/11 A-2103 Langenzersdorf / AT | [1989/20] | Representative(s) | Kunz, Ekkehard VA TECH Patente Gmbh & Co, Stahlstrasse 21 a 4031 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | Kunz, Ekkehard, Dr. Chemie Linz Ges.m.b.H. Abteilung Patente St. Peter-Str. 25 A-4021 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 88118752.0 | 10.11.1988 | [1989/20] | Priority number, date | DE19873738458 | 12.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3738458 | [1989/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0315993 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0315993 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/14, C08G69/32, C08G81/00 | [1989/20] | CPC: |
C08G73/14 (EP);
C08G69/32 (EP);
C08G81/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/29] |
Former [1991/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | ||
Former [1989/20] | ES, GR | Title | German: | Lösliche und/oder schmelzbare Polyamid-Polyamid-, Polyamid-Polyamidimid- und Polyamid-Polyimid-Blockcopolymere | [1989/20] | English: | Soluble and/or fusible block polyamide-polyamides, polyamide-polyamideimides and polyamides-polyimides | [1989/20] | French: | Copolymères séquensés solubles et/ou fusibles du type polyamide-polyamide, polyamide-polyamideimide et polyamide-polyimide | [1989/20] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/30: Verbunden mit 88910006.1/0386088 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 07.06.91 | EPB 1991/30: Consolidated with 88910006.1/0386088 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 07.06.91 | EPB 1991/30: Jointe à la demande no. 88910006.1/0386088 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 07.06.91 | Examination procedure | 28.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 16.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 12.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58222112 ; | [A]EP0162606 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]EP0210036 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 100, Nr. 22, 28. Mai 1984, Seite 17, Nr. 175555v, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-58 222 112 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, INC.) 23-12-1983, & JP58222112 A 00000000 |