EP0317887 - Process for preparing polyurethane and polyisocyanurat foams employing phosphoric acid tri(2-propyl-2-phosphonic-acid dimethyl ester) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/22] | Use of phosphoric acid tri(2-propyl-2-phosphonic-acid dimethyl esters) in the preparation of polymers based on isocyanate | ||
[1995/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiedermann, Rolf, Dr. Wiesenstrasse 18 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
Adam, Norbert, Dr. Semmelweisstrasse 79 D-5000 Koeln 80 / DE | [1989/22] | Application number, filing date | 88119075.5 | 17.11.1988 | [1989/22] | Priority number, date | DE19873739764 | 24.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3739764 | [1989/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0317887 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0317887 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317887 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/53 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
C08K5/5333 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/5333, C08L75/04 (EP);
C08K5/5333, C08L79/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, LI [1989/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyurethan- und Polyisocyanuratschaumstoffen unter Verwendung von Phosphorigsäure-tris (2-propyl-2-phosphonsäure-dimethylester) | [1995/14] | English: | Process for preparing polyurethane and polyisocyanurat foams employing phosphoric acid tri(2-propyl-2-phosphonic-acid dimethyl ester) | [1995/14] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation des mousses de polymères d'isocyanate et d'isocyanurat avec utilisation de diacide phosphorique-tris(2-propyl-2-acide phosphonique-ester diméthylique) | [1995/14] |
Former [1989/22] | Verwendung von Phosphorigsäure-tris (2-propyl-2-phosphonsäure-dimethylester) bei der Herstellung von Kunstsstoffen auf Isocyanatbasis | ||
Former [1989/22] | Use of phosphoric acid tri(2-propyl-2-phosphonic-acid dimethyl esters) in the preparation of polymers based on isocyanate | ||
Former [1989/22] | Utilisation diacide phosphorique-tris(2-propyl-2-acide phosphonique-ester diméthylique) dans la préparation de polymères à partir d'isocyanate | Examination procedure | 17.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 07.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 24.02.1994 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3058941 (BIRUM GAIL H); | [A]GB941706 (MONSANTO CHEMICALS) | Examination | US3014944 | DE2732292 | - Ballard/Taylor Polyurethanes World Congress, 1991 Proceedings of the SPI ISOPA, September 24-26, 1991. S.182-189 | - Oertel, Polyurethane, Kunststoff Handbuch Band 7 (2.Ausgabe, Hanser Verlag 1983), S.273 |