EP0320638 - Decorative embossed surface coverings having platey material and inlaid appearance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannington Mills, Inc. P.O. Box 30 Mannington Mills Road Salem New Jersey 08079 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states Mannington Mills, Inc. P.O. Box 30 Mannington Mills Road Salem New Jersey 08079 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, C.David. 207 Harker Avenue Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | 02 /
Shultz, Jeffrey R. 369 Grant Street Salem New Jersey 08079 / US | 03 /
Chen, Hao A. 59 Carter Way Glenn Mills Pennsylvania 19342 / US | 04 /
Minter, James L. 5513 Three Locks Road Chillicotte Ohio 45601 / US | 05 /
Brower, Charles H. 69 5th Street Pennsville New Jersey 08070 / US | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Geissler, Bernhard, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Geissler, Bernhard, Dr. jur., Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88119144.9 | 17.11.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | US19870121845 | 17.11.1987 Original published format: US 121845 | [1989/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0320638 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0320638 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B44C5/00, B44F7/00, B44F9/04, B05D5/06 | [1989/25] | CPC: |
B44C3/02 (EP,US);
B44C3/04 (EP,US);
B44C5/005 (EP,US);
B44F7/00 (EP,US);
B44F9/04 (EP,US);
B44F9/08 (EP,US);
D06N7/0028 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24876 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1989/25] | Title | German: | Dekorativ geprägte Überzüge mit plättchenförmigem Material und vom Aussehen wie eine eingelegte Arbeit | [1989/25] | English: | Decorative embossed surface coverings having platey material and inlaid appearance | [1989/25] | French: | Revêtements décoratifs en relief contenant des paillettes et paraissant incrustés | [1989/25] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 10.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.11.1994 | ES | 18.11.1994 | SE | 18.11.1994 | [2004/37] |
Former [1996/14] | AT | 17.11.1994 | |
SE | 18.11.1994 | ||
Former [1996/03] | SE | 18.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3328499 (RONALD BARNETTE STANLEY); | [Y]GB1163962 (GAF CORP [US]); | [A]US4025665 (HANNON MARTIN J); | [Y]US4090773 (BAUER PETER, et al); | [A]US4409280 (WILEY JOHN W [US], et al); | [Y]US4464423 (LABIANCA MICHAEL H [US], et al) |