EP0313105 - Improved communications interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Computer Automation, Inc. 4890 Sterling Drive Boulder Colorado 80301 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states Computer Automation, Inc. 4890 Sterling Drive Boulder Colorado 80301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friedman, Michael S. 5482 Catowba Irvine California 92715 / US | 02 /
Thomas, Kenneth D. 1300 N. Clinton, No. 14 Santa Ana California 92631 / US | 03 /
Chan, Philip T. 2108 Woodbriar Court Fullerton California 92631 / US | 04 /
Slick, Royce Earle 24452 Diamante Mission Viejo California 92692 / US | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Rushton, Ronald, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Rushton, Ronald, et al SOMMERVILLE & RUSHTON 11 Holywell Hill St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 1EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88119183.7 | 18.08.1983 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | US19820409510 | 19.08.1982 Original published format: US 409510 | US19830470517 | 28.02.1983 Original published format: US 470517 | [1989/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0313105 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/16 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
H04L1/1835 (EP);
H04L12/2801 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/17] | Title | German: | Übertragungsschnittstelle | [1989/17] | English: | Improved communications interface | [1989/17] | French: | Interface de communications | [1989/17] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 26.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/19] | 11.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP83304790.5 / EP0102225 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4332027 ; | [A]EP0046831 | [X] - IEEE MICROS, MINIS AND MAXIS, Technology thrust VS user requirement, COMPCON-FALL meeting, Washington, 6th-9th September 1977, 15th Conference, pages 320-325, IEEE, New York, US; M. TOKORO et al.: "Acknowledging ethernet" | [X] - POST OFFICE ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS JOURNAL, vol. 68, no. 1, April 1975, pages 22-28, London, GB; W. NEIL et al.: "Experimental packet-switched service: Procedures and protocols; Part 2: Transmission procedures" | [XP] - COMPUTER DESIGN, vol. 22, no. 8, July 1983, pages 49-52, Winchester, Mass., US; "Collision avoidance accelerates transfers" |