EP0316936 - AC tig welding apparatus using hot wire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BABCOCK-HITACHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-2, 2-chome, Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1989/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hori, Katsuyoshi Babcock-Hitachi K.K.Kure Kenkyusho 3-36, Takaramachi Kure-shi / JP | 02 /
Butsusaki, Yasuhiro Babcock-Hitachi K.K.Kure Kenkyusho 3-36, Takaramachi Kure-shi / JP | 03 /
Takuwa, Toshiaki Babcock-Hitachi K.K.Yokohama Kojo 2-10, Isogo-1-chome Isogo-ku Yokohama / JP | 04 /
Matsumura, Yoshiaki Babcock-Hitachi K.K. Kure Kojo 6-9, Takaramachi Kure-shi / JP | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88119216.5 | 18.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | JP19870290550 | 19.11.1987 Original published format: JP 29055087 | [1989/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0316936 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0316936 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0316936 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/10, B23K9/09 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
B23K9/1093 (EP,US);
B23K9/16 (KR);
B23K9/091 (EP,US);
B23K9/10 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1989/21] | B23K9/10, B23K9/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1992/29] |
Former [1989/21] | DE, FR, GB, SE | Title | German: | AC-WIG-Schweissgerät mit heissem Draht | [1989/21] | English: | AC tig welding apparatus using hot wire | [1989/21] | French: | Appareil de soudage TIG à courant alternatif utilisant un fil chaud | [1989/21] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 18.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0139249 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK [JP]); | [A]US4467176 (MIZUNO TAKAJI [JP], et al); | [A]FR2503604 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]DE3103247 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP]) |