EP0318796 - Substituted benzoyl(thio) ureas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sirrenberg, Wilhelm, Dr. Wuppertaler Strasse 21 D-4322 Sprockhövel / DE | 02 /
Marhold, Albrecht, Dr. Carl-Duisberg-Strasse 329 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 03 /
Becker, Benedikt, Dr. Metzkausener Strasse 14 D-4020 Mettmann / DE | 04 /
Stendel, Wilhelm, Dr. In den Birken 55 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1989/23] | Application number, filing date | 88119383.3 | 22.11.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | DE19873740807 | 02.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3740807 | [1989/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0318796 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0318796 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318796 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C275/54, C07C335/26, C07C331/28, C07C265/12, A01N47/34 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
C07C335/26 (EP,KR,US);
C07C275/54 (EP,KR,US);
A01N47/34 (EP,KR,US);
C07C265/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/23] | C07C127/22, C07C157/12, C07C119/048, A01N47/34 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/23] | Title | German: | Substituierte Benzoyl(thio)harnstoffe | [1989/23] | English: | Substituted benzoyl(thio) ureas | [1989/23] | French: | Benzoyl(thio)urées substituées | [1989/23] | Examination procedure | 22.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 11.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0246061 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [YP]EP0268943 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0268952 (BAYER AG [DE]) |