EP0318810 - Securing and adjustment device particularly for ski boots [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A. Via Montebelluna 5/7 31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A. Via Montebelluna 5/7 I-31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | ||
Former [1989/23] | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A Via Montebelluna 5/7 I-31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baggio, Giorgio Via Lamarmora 30 I-35018 San Martino di Lupari (Padova) / IT | 02 /
Bambace, Alessandro Via Palladio 8 I-31033 Castelfranco Veneto (Treviso) / IT | [1989/23] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88119471.6 | 23.11.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | IT19870082610 | 03.12.1987 Original published format: IT 8261087 | [1989/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0318810 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0318810 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318810 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
A43B5/0445 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1989/23] | Title | German: | Spann- und Einstellvorrichtung, insbesondere für Skistiefel | [1989/23] | English: | Securing and adjustment device particularly for ski boots | [1989/23] | French: | Dispositif de maintien et d'ajustement, en particulier pour chaussure de ski | [1989/23] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 29.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2405665 (NORDICA SPA [IT]); | [X]DE8416842U ; | [A]DE3501091 (OLIVIERI ICARO & C [IT]); | [A]DE3504002 (LEDERER JOSEF [DE]) | [A] - O. RICHTER und R.v. VOSS: "Bauelemente der Feinmechanik", achte Auflage, Veb Verlag Technik, Berlin, 1959 | Examination | - O. RICHTER und R.v. VOSS: "Bauelemente der Feinmechanik", achte Auflage, Veb Verlag Technik, Berlin, 1959, pages 75, 76, section 2612. |