EP0321723 - Apparatus for a data processing system having a peer relationship among a plurality of central processing units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/26] | Apparatus and method for a data processing system having a peer relationship among a plurality of central processing units | ||
[1995/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. 300 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821-4186 / US | [1995/26] |
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states Honeywell Bull Inc. 3800 W. 80th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55431 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Curley, John L. 23, Willow Ridge Road North Andover Massachusetts 01845 / US | 02 /
Hirsch, Thomas S. 24, Fox Run Road Bedford Massachusetts 01730 / US | 03 /
Penney, John C. 3, Abbott Lane Chelmsford Massachusetts 01824 / US | 04 /
Reisch, Ileana S. 53, Nathan Lane Carlisle Massachusetts 01741 / US | 05 /
Staplin, Theodore R., Jr. 104, Garrison Road Chelmsford Massachusetts 01824 / US | 06 /
Wurz, David A. 12, Bellevue Avenue Winchester Massachusetts 01890 / US | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/26] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88119577.0 | 24.11.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | US19870136055 | 21.12.1987 Original published format: US 136055 | [1989/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0321723 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0321723 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0321723 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
G06F9/4843 (EP,US);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F13/387 (EP,US);
G06F15/161 (EP,US);
G06F9/5011 (EP,US);
G06F9/5061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/29] |
Former [1989/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für ein Datenverarbeitungssystem mit gleichmengiger Beziehung zwischen einer Vielzahl von zentralen Datenverarbeitungseinheiten | [1995/52] | English: | Apparatus for a data processing system having a peer relationship among a plurality of central processing units | [1995/52] | French: | Appareil pour un système de traitement de données à relation d'égal à égal entre plusieurs unités centrales de traitement | [1995/52] |
Former [1989/26] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für ein Datenverarbeitungssystem mit gleichmengiger Beziehung zwischen einer Vielzahl von zentralen Datenverarbeitungseinheiten | ||
Former [1989/26] | Apparatus and method for a data processing system having a peer relationship among a plurality of central processing units | ||
Former [1989/26] | Appareil et méthode pour un système de traitement de données à relation d'égal à égal entre plusieurs unités centrales de traitement | Examination procedure | 02.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 25.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP60120636 ; | [Y]WO8304117 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]); | [Y]EP0147574 (IBM [US]); | [Y]EP0192944 (IBM [US]); | [YP]GB2204432 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 277 (E-355)(2000) November 6, 1985 & JP-A-60 120 636 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHEIN K.K. ) June 28, 1985, & JP60120636 A 00000000 | [A] - IEEE ELECTRO vol. 7, May 1982, NEW YORK, US pages 1 - 11; J. PARADISE: 'CDP1800-series multiprocessing for maximum performance ' |