EP0321724 - Apparatus and method for alterable resource partitioning enforcement in a data processing system having central processing units using different operating systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. 300 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821-4186 / US | [1995/36] |
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states Honeywell Bull Inc. 3800 W. 80th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55431 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McNally, Lance 11, Shirley Road Townsend Massachusetts, 01469 / US | 02 /
Booth, Anthony J. 400, Stow Road Boxboro Massachusetts, 01719 / US | 03 /
Morley, Peter 101 Jewett Street Pepperell Massachusetts, 01463 / US | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/26] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88119578.8 | 24.11.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | US19870136056 | 21.12.1987 Original published format: US 136056 | [1989/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0321724 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0321724 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0321724 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
G06F9/4843 (EP,US);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F15/161 (EP,US);
G06F9/468 (EP,US);
G06F9/5061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/20] |
Former [1989/26] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Durchführung von änderbarer Betriebsmittelaufteilung in einem Datenverarbeitungssystem mit zentralen Datenverarbeitungseinheiten mit verschiedenen Betriebssystemen | [1989/26] | English: | Apparatus and method for alterable resource partitioning enforcement in a data processing system having central processing units using different operating systems | [1989/26] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour l'exécution du partage altérable de ressources dans un système de traitement de données avec unités centrales de traitement utilisant différents systèmes d'exploitation | [1989/26] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 26.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60120636 ; | [X]EP0192944 (IBM [US]); | [Y]WO8304117 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]); | [A]EP0147574 (IBM [US]) | [A] - IEEE ELECTRO, vol. 7, May 1982, pages 33/4 1-11, New York, US; J. PARADISE: "CDP1800-series multiprocessing for maximum performance" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 277 (E-355)[2000], 6th November 1985; & JP-A-60 120 636 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN K.K.) 28-06-1985, & JP60120636 A 00000000 |