EP0319821 - Device for discharging high-speed presses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Dieter Sandbergstrasse 6 D-8510 Fürth / DE | 02 /
Kröner, Josef Am Pfaffensteig 10 D-8540 Schwabach / DE | [1989/24] | Application number, filing date | 88119831.1 | 28.11.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | DE19873742138 | 11.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3742138 | [1989/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0319821 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0319821 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0319821 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B21D43/16 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
B21D43/16 (EP);
B23Q7/12 (EP);
B26D7/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Entsorgung von Schnelläuferpressen | [1989/24] | English: | Device for discharging high-speed presses | [1989/24] | French: | Dispositif pour le déchargement de presses rapides | [1989/24] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 21.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3555946 (ADDIS WILLIAM L); | [A]FR2075213 (NORTON TOOL CO LTD); | [A]FR2103819 (SCHULER GMBH L); | [A]DE3538258 (SCHULER GMBH L [DE]); | [A]US2542630 (CONNER GUY O); | [A]DE2312898 (SCHULER GMBH L); | [A]DE2650130 (CANRON INC N D GES D STAATES N) | [A] - WERKSTATTSTECHNIK. ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR INDUSTRIELLE FERTIGUNG, Band 74, Nr. 1, Januar 1984, Seiten 9-12; P. FELSMANN: "Materialfluss an einem Blechbearbeitungszentrum" | [A] - SHEET METAL INDUSTRIES, Band 64, Nr. 10, Oktober 1987, Seite 522; B. ASBEY et al.: "Jit process applied to high speed presses" |