EP0326675 - Sealing strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred Kunz GmbH & Co. Bavariaring 26 D-80336 München / DE | [1989/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haas, Jürgen Hangweg 2 D-8137 Leoni / DE | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/32] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120174.3 | 02.12.1988 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | DE19883803060 | 02.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3803060 | [1989/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0326675 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326675 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E21D11/38 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
E21D11/385 (EP);
E04F15/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1989/32] | Title | German: | Dichtungsband | [1989/32] | English: | Sealing strip | [1989/32] | French: | Ruban d'étanchéité | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 26.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.11.1991 | ES | 21.11.1991 | GB | 21.11.1991 | GR | 21.11.1991 | NL | 21.11.1991 | AT | 31.12.1991 | CH | 31.12.1991 | LI | 31.12.1991 | LU | 31.12.1991 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | BE | 21.11.1991 | |
GB | 21.11.1991 | ||
GR | 21.11.1991 | ||
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
AT | 31.12.1991 | ||
CH | 31.12.1991 | ||
LI | 31.12.1991 | ||
LU | 31.12.1991 | ||
Former [1999/52] | BE | 21.11.1991 | |
GB | 21.11.1991 | ||
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
AT | 31.12.1991 | ||
CH | 31.12.1991 | ||
LI | 31.12.1991 | ||
LU | 31.12.1991 | ||
Former [1993/34] | BE | 21.11.1991 | |
GB | 21.11.1991 | ||
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
AT | 31.12.1991 | ||
CH | 31.12.1991 | ||
LI | 31.12.1991 | ||
Former [1993/13] | BE | 21.11.1991 | |
GB | 21.11.1991 | ||
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
CH | 31.12.1991 | ||
LI | 31.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/41] | BE | 21.11.1991 | |
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
CH | 31.12.1991 | ||
LI | 31.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/37] | BE | 21.11.1991 | |
NL | 21.11.1991 | ||
Former [1992/27] | NL | 21.11.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1260747 ; | [A]DE1289543 (GERD LESCHUS KUNSTSTOFF FABRIK); | [A]DE1806902 (ZUEBLIN AG); | [A]FR2520798 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]); | [A]DE3543808 (SEMPERIT AG [DE]) |