EP0321767 - Arrangement for the electrothermal treatment of food [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 22.12.1993 [1993/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 D-81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Husslein, Julius, Dipl.-Ing. Am Birkenweg 8 D-2821 Vachendorf / DE | 02 /
Hess, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Gartenstrasse 13 D-8225 Traunreut / DE | 03 /
Beifuss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Föhrenweg 4 D-8225 Traunreut / DE | [1989/26] | Application number, filing date | 88120278.2 | 05.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | DE19873743919 | 23.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3743919 | [1989/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0321767 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0321767 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/66, H05B6/80, H05B6/68 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
H05B6/64 (KR);
H05B6/6447 (EP);
H05B6/66 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/26] | H05B6/66, H05B6/80 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [1989/26] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur wärmetechnischen Behandlung von Lebensmitteln | [1989/26] | English: | Arrangement for the electrothermal treatment of food | [1989/26] | French: | Disposition pour le traitement électrothermique des aliments | [1989/26] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 30.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/51] | 08.08.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4210795 (LENTZ RONALD R [US]); | [Y]EP0234528 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]); | [Y]DE1148677 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH); | [A]US4211911 (DEHN RUDOLPH A [US]); | [A]US4714810 (SIRKIS MURRAY D [US]) |