EP0372114 - Massage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.09.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.1992 | Refusal of application | published on 28.10.1992 [1992/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nishiguchi, Hidetsugu 561, Meiwa-cho oaza Uninaka Taki-gun Mie 515-03 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | For all designated states Nishiguchi, Hidetsugu 561, Meiwa-cho oaza Uninaka Taki-gun Mie 515-03 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Steinmeister, Helmut, et al Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Steinmeister, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte TER MEER-MÜLLER-STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 D-33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120465.5 | 07.12.1988 | [1990/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0372114 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61H39/04, A61H7/00 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
A61H39/04 (EP,US);
A61H15/00 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1669 (EP,US);
A61H2205/04 (EP,US);
A61H2205/065 (EP,US);
A61H2205/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/24] | Title | German: | Massagegerät | [1990/24] | English: | Massage device | [1990/24] | French: | Appareil de massage | [1990/24] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 28.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/44] | 28.05.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3037435 (MATONIA REINHOLD) |