EP0321795 - Pilot circuit with integrated circuit with preset firing delay for MOS power transistors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 I-20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gola, Alberto Via Eseguiti, 22 I-27043 Broni (Pavia) / IT | 02 /
Pessina, Gianluigi Via Roma, 65 I-20020 Lainate (Milano) / IT | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Mittler, Enrico, et al c/o Marchi & Mittler s.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 I-20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88120537.1 | 08.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | IT19870023181 | 23.12.1987 Original published format: IT 2318187 | [1989/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0321795 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0321795 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0321795 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/30, H03K17/16, H03K17/725 | [1991/01] | CPC: |
G11B19/20 (EP,US);
H03K17/04123 (EP,US);
H03K17/04206 (EP,US);
H03K17/145 (EP,US);
H03K17/284 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/26] | H03K17/284 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1989/26] | Title | German: | Steuerungsschaltung mit integrierter Schaltung mit vorgegebener Zündverzögerung für MOS-Leistungstransistoren | [1989/26] | English: | Pilot circuit with integrated circuit with preset firing delay for MOS power transistors | [1989/26] | French: | Circuit de pilotage avec circuit intégré avec délai d'amorçage préétabli pour transistors MOS de puissance | [1989/26] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/30] | 27.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 26.04.1995 | SE | 26.07.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [1996/04] | SE | 26.07.1995 | Cited in | Examination | US3862441 | EP0145835 |