EP0330749 - Semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.1992 [1992/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichikawa, Keiji 1454-4, Imajuku-Higashi-Cho Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Ohno, Jun-ichi 1-24-24, Nagata-Higashi Minami-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120623.9 | 09.12.1988 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | JP19870313672 | 11.12.1987 Original published format: JP 31367287 | [1989/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0330749 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/50, H01L23/30 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
H01L24/85 (EP);
H01L23/28 (KR);
H01L23/16 (EP);
H01L23/49506 (EP);
H01L23/4951 (EP);
H01L24/48 (EP);
H01L2224/451 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48247 (EP);
H01L2224/48465 (EP);
H01L2224/4899 (EP);
H01L2224/49171 (EP);
H01L24/45 (EP);
H01L24/49 (EP);
H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/01014 (EP);
H01L2924/01015 (EP);
H01L2924/01033 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/451, H01L2924/00015 (EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48465, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/78 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/85399 (EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/36] | Title | German: | Halbleiteranordnung | [1989/36] | English: | Semiconductor device | [1989/36] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur | [1989/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 14.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/13] | 25.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP6084854 ; | [Y]JP6060743 ; | [A]JP5624958 ; | [A]EP0078606 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 230 (E-343)[1953], 17th September 1985; & JP-A-60 84 854 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 14-05-1985, & JP6084854 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 193 (E-334)[1916], 9th August 1985; & JP-A-60 60 743 (MATSUSHITA DENSHI KOGYO K.K.) 08-04-1985, & JP6060743 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 78 (E-58)[750], 22nd May 1981; & JP-A-56 24 958 (KIYUUSHIYUU NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 10-03-1981, & JP5624958 A 00000000 |