EP0322620 - Electrochemical storage cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.1992 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knödler, Reinhard, Dr. rer. nat. Lattweg 17 D-6902 Sandhausen / DE | 02 /
Reiss, Karl Panoramastrasse 4 D-6913 Mühlheim-Rettigheim / DE | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1989/27] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 88120679.1 | 10.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | DE19873742608 | 16.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3742608 | [1989/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0322620 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/66, H01M10/39 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
H01M4/661 (EP,US);
C22C38/18 (EP,US);
H01M10/3909 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Elektrochemische Speicherzelle | [1989/27] | English: | Electrochemical storage cell | [1989/27] | French: | Pile électrochimique de stockage d'énergie | [1989/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 27.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/04] | 14.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1595192 (CHLORIDE SILENT POWER LTD); | [X]DE2720726 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [X]US4460662 (DAMROW PAUL A [US], et al); | [X]GB2182347 (SECR DEFENCE); | [AD]EP0064213 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) | [X] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON SODIUM-SULFUR BATTERIES, PROC. ELECTROCH. SOC., Band 87-5, Seiten 237-246, The Electrochemical Society, Inc.; A.P. BROWN et al.: "The corrosion of metals and alloys by sodium polysulfide melts at 350 degrees centigrades | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, Band 126, Nr. 12, Dezember 1979, Seiten 2254-2257, Manchester, New Hampshire, US; E.M. JALLOULI et al.: "Fe-Cr-Al Alloy, high temperature corrosion in sulfur vapor" | [X] - EXTENDED ABSTRACTS, Band 84, Nr. 2, Oktober 1984, Seiten 151-152, Nr. 102, New Orleans, Louisiana, US; F. GROSS et al.: "Present tasks of research in sodium/sulfur battery development" | [A] - MATERIALS PERFORMANCE, Band 20, Nr. 2, Februar 1981, Seiten 13-18, Texas, Houston, National Association of Corrosion Engineers, US; R.R. DUBIN: "Evaluation of container materials for the sodium-sulfur battery |